NY S03877 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a county representation system for electing the governor and lieutenant-governor within the state.
Title
Establishes a county representation system for electing the governor and lieutenant-governor within the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-07-08 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3877A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-08 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06324 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary