NY S03873 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.298
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.298
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs boards of cooperative educational services to establish an agriculture program for students.
Title
Authorizes and directs boards of cooperative educational services to establish an agriculture program for students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.298 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7104a |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | referred to education |
2020-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.468 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3873A |
2020-02-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07104 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.298