NY S03861 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sexual abuse in the first degree where a person is incapable of consent while a passenger on public transportation and the contact was intentional and with the sole purpose of sexual gratification; relates to public lewdness while a passenger on public transportation.
Title
Relates to sexual abuse in the first degree where a person is incapable of consent while a passenger on public transportation and the contact was intentional and with the sole purpose of sexual gratification; relates to public lewdness while a passenger on public transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.476 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.656 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05412 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes