NY S03854 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the diminution of health insurance benefits of public employee retirees and their dependents or reducing the employer's contributions for such insurance; defines employers to include the state, municipalities, school districts, and public authorities and commissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the diminution of health insurance benefits of public employee retirees and their dependents or reducing the employer's contributions for such insurance; defines employers to include the state, municipalities, school districts, and public authorities and commissions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.314
2019-02-20SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04203 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback