NY S03852 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02AssemblySIGNED CHAP.143
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.268
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a5502a
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3852A
2019-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.465
2019-02-20SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A05502 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s3852a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback