NY S03847 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an order of protection that has been issued to a victim of domestic violence to include a provision that the order shall not expire or be vacated unless the party against whom such order is issued is in compliance with any court order directing him or her to pay child support and requires an automatic income deduction order for such order of support.
Title
Requires an order of protection that has been issued to a victim of domestic violence to include a provision that the order shall not expire or be vacated unless the party against whom such order is issued is in compliance with any court order directing him or her to pay child support and requires an automatic income deduction order for such order of support.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1279 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |