NY S03843 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5900A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5900A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a technical correction to the additional real property tax exemption for certain redevelopment company projects.
Title
Makes a technical correction to the additional real property tax exemption for certain redevelopment company projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5900A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3843A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2013-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.176 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05900 (Same As) 2013-11-13 - signed chap.478