NY S03840 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to conciliation and non-compliance with public assistance employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to conciliation and non-compliance with public assistance employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-05Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.391
2019-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a2455a
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.607
2019-04-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 3840A
2019-04-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-04-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-19SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

A02455 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - substituted by s3840a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03840&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03840&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03840
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03840&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03840A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3840#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3840#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3840#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03840&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback