NY S03838 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3838A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the production of synthetic turf; defines terms; provides that no person may install or cause to install a synthetic turf product on any part of the grounds of any piece of public or private property that consists of synthetic turf product materials containing fifty or more parts of lead per each one million parts of any synthetic turf product material examined.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulates the production of synthetic turf; defines terms; provides that no person may install or cause to install a synthetic turf product on any part of the grounds of any piece of public or private property that consists of synthetic turf product materials containing fifty or more parts of lead per each one million parts of any synthetic turf product material examined.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 3838A
2012-10-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2012-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2011-03-07SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A07071 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback