NY S03835 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3835A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3835A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a farm savings account program.
Title
Establishes a farm savings account program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3835A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.447 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04840 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - print number 4840a