NY S03834 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing notice to school districts and nonpublic schools located in a city with a population of one million or more of certain construction projects; requires county superintendents to provide written notice to such school districts and nonpublic schools of certain construction projects undertaken within three hundred feet of a building of such school districts or nonpublic schools.
Title
Relates to providing notice to school districts and nonpublic schools located in a city with a population of one million or more of certain construction projects; requires county superintendents to provide written notice to such school districts and nonpublic schools of certain construction projects undertaken within three hundred feet of a building of such school districts or nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3834A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.906 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |