NY S03823 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to distinctive license plates issued to gold star mothers; permits gold star mothers to retain one keepsake plate as a commemorative item after distinctive plates are surrendered.
Title
Relates to distinctive license plates issued to gold star mothers; permits gold star mothers to retain one keepsake plate as a commemorative item after distinctive plates are surrendered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.239 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.632 |
2021-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |