NY S03821 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility for New York state paid family leave benefits by persons engaged in a teaching capacity in a religious institution.
Title
Relates to the eligibility for New York state paid family leave benefits by persons engaged in a teaching capacity in a religious institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.165 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05875 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to labor