NY S03807 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to creating the "empire state cricket task force" to promote and grow the game of cricket in New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to creating the "empire state cricket task force" to promote and grow the game of cricket in New York state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.148
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a6306b
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED (T) 3807B
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1032
2019-05-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 3807A
2019-05-15SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2019-02-15SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A06306 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s3807b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03807&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03807&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03807
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03807&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03807A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03807&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03807B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3807#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3807#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03807&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback