NY S03801 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability benefits for firefighters employed by the division of military and naval affairs.
Title
Relates to disability benefits for firefighters employed by the division of military and naval affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.246 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1683 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3801 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.123 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.123 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4436 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1683 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04436 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled