NY S03799 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the investigative powers of the Civilian Complaint Review Board to include complaints alleging bias-based profiling.
Title
Expands the investigative powers of the Civilian Complaint Review Board to include complaints alleging bias-based profiling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3799A |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.549 |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |