NY S03791 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE
2018-03-19SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2017-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 3791A
2017-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2017-05-01SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE
2017-03-13SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2017-01-27SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A00566 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback