NY S03788 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.165 |
2019-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.44 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a217a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.817 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3788A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00217 (Same As) 2019-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.165