NY S03767 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city housing authority, in reviewing applicants, to grant homeless domestic violence victims the same preference as granted the homeless.
Title
Requires the New York city housing authority, in reviewing applicants, to grant homeless domestic violence victims the same preference as granted the homeless.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.353 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.208 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03583 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken