NY S03716 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Title
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.655 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04482 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes