NY S03698 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that local governments comply with a detainer request issued by a federal law enforcement agency; further requires that such local government not interfere with the ability of federal law enforcement officials to conduct enforcement activities at municipal or county jails in furtherance of their duty to enforce federal laws.
Title
Requires that local governments comply with a detainer request issued by a federal law enforcement agency; further requires that such local government not interfere with the ability of federal law enforcement officials to conduct enforcement activities at municipal or county jails in furtherance of their duty to enforce federal laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.724 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A02872 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations