NY S03693 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a privately owned vacant property temporary public benefit use exemption.
Title
Relates to a privately owned vacant property temporary public benefit use exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.751 |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |