NY S03685 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that authorities having control of a fire department or fire company which provides emergency medical services may establish fees and charges for services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that authorities having control of a fire department or fire company which provides emergency medical services may establish fees and charges for services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3685B
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.567
2019-04-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 3685A
2019-04-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-02-12SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01778 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - print number 1778a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback