NY S03679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a real property tax exemption task force.
Title
Establishes a real property tax exemption task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.27 |
2020-12-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2020-11-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a3330a |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.274 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3679A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03330 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.27