NY S03674 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the granting of academic credit at state or city operated institutions to veterans.
Title
Allows the granting of academic credit at state or city operated institutions to veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | AMENDED 3674B |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.300 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3674A |
2017-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.514 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A03179 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - print number 3179b