NY S03673 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes industrial development agencies to provide technical and financial assistance to agricultural producers for products grown, harvested or produced within the state.
Title
Authorizes industrial development agencies to provide technical and financial assistance to agricultural producers for products grown, harvested or produced within the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Edward Rath III [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |