NY S03672 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assignment of counsel.
Title
Relates to the assignment of counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.446 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1005 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3672 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.16 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-10 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A748 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1005 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00748 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.446