NY S03667 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the anchoring of furniture and electronics in child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities.
Title
Requires the anchoring of furniture and electronics in child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3667C |
2018-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3667B |
2017-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3667A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05284 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - COMMITTED TO RULES