NY S03662 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3662B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3662B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax credit for the installation of fire sprinkler systems.
Title
Provides a tax credit for the installation of fire sprinkler systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3662B |
2022-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3662A |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08639 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - referred to ways and means