NY S03661 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure and discovery of the testimony of a party to a health care quality assurance or peer review proceeding; further adds the failure to cooperate and participate in the quality assurance, reporting, activities, requirements and procedures covered under such discovery to the definition of professional misconduct.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure and discovery of the testimony of a party to a health care quality assurance or peer review proceeding; further adds the failure to cooperate and participate in the quality assurance, reporting, activities, requirements and procedures covered under such discovery to the definition of professional misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1487 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.717 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02460 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes