NY S03656 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires child protective services to document home visits as part of a treatment plan, supervision and monitoring, pursuant to a court order, or on an emergency basis with photographs.
Title
Requires child protective services to document home visits as part of a treatment plan, supervision and monitoring, pursuant to a court order, or on an emergency basis with photographs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.621 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |