NY S03655 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3655B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3655B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the out-of-state placement committee to develop standards, regulations and recommendations for aversive crisis intervention methods and techniques; establishes a holistic autism spectrum disorder treatment center.
Title
Requires the out-of-state placement committee to develop standards, regulations and recommendations for aversive crisis intervention methods and techniques; establishes a holistic autism spectrum disorder treatment center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3655B |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3655A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01073 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - print number 1073c