NY S03638 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Title
Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7472 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1533 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07472 (Same As) 2021-11-11 - approval memo.38