NY S03637 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain time frames for action by insurers relating to requests for unclaimed life insurance through the lost policy finder.
Title
Amends certain time frames for action by insurers relating to requests for unclaimed life insurance through the lost policy finder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.468 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.70 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a3075 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-03-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.249 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03075 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.468