NY S03624 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the licensing authority in each county to process firearms license applications for victims of domestic abuse who have been issued an order of protection within 14 days of receiving the application.
Title
Directs the licensing authority in each county to process firearms license applications for victims of domestic abuse who have been issued an order of protection within 14 days of receiving the application.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |