NY S03623 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that spouses who voluntarily separate from employment to accompany a spouse who is the subject of a military transfer shall be eligible for unemployment benefits.
Title
Provides that spouses who voluntarily separate from employment to accompany a spouse who is the subject of a military transfer shall be eligible for unemployment benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.610 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.480 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7514 |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.366 |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07514 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s3623