NY S03616 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to credit unions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to credit unions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2015-05-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2015-02-13SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A00774 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback