NY S03614 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3614E
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3614E
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the salary ranges tied to member contribution requirements; ties salary amount to inflation.
Title
Increases the salary ranges tied to member contribution requirements; ties salary amount to inflation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3614E |
2024-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3614D |
2024-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3614C |
2024-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3614B |
2023-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3614A |
2023-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05209 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees