NY S03608 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.588
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing a video on the dangers of drowning for infants and young children to be viewed by a parent and/or parents of newborn children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing a video on the dangers of drowning for infants and young children to be viewed by a parent and/or parents of newborn children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25SenateSIGNED CHAP.588
2023-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.504
2023-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a4987a
2023-05-09Assemblyreferred to health
2023-05-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.706
2023-04-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 3608A
2023-04-17SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
2023-02-01SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES

Same As/Similar To

A04987 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s3608a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback