NY S03603 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Cortland to impose a tax of one dollar per five hundred dollars on real estate transfers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Cortland to impose a tax of one dollar per five hundred dollars on real estate transfers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A1261
2023-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.733
2023-02-01SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A01261 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.541

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback