NY S03602 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - VETOED MEMO.6821
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - VETOED MEMO.6821
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes wineries to engage in custom crush wine production allowing individuals to assist in the production of wine for sale for personal or family use.
Title
Authorizes wineries to engage in custom crush wine production allowing individuals to assist in the production of wine for sale for personal or family use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-01 | VETOED MEMO.6821 | |
2010-09-20 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-22 | returned to senate | |
2010-03-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-22 | ordered to third reading cal.737 | |
2010-03-22 | substituted for a2322 | |
2010-01-27 | referred to economic development | |
2010-01-26 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-26 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-01-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-01-20 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-01-19 | 1ST REPORT CAL.16 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-03-25 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A2322 (Same As) 2010-03-22 - substituted by s3602