NY S03595 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the law enforcement misconduct investigative office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the law enforcement misconduct investigative office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16AssemblySIGNED CHAP.104
2020-06-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.108
2020-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a10002b
2020-06-10Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.679
2020-06-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 3595C
2020-06-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 3595B
2020-06-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-06-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 3595A
2020-06-05SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-02-11SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10002 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - substituted by s3595c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3595
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03595&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03595
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03595&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03595A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03595&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03595B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03595&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03595C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3595#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03595&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3595#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3595#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback