NY S03581 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that notice be provided to any officer or employee of the department of corrections and community supervision whose personal information is the subject of a subpoena duces tecum.
Title
Requires that notice be provided to any officer or employee of the department of corrections and community supervision whose personal information is the subject of a subpoena duces tecum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.122 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.505 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06888 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction