NY S03563 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the exemption from filing requirements only with respect to rates and policy forms to businesses underwritten and transacted from an office outside this state.
Title
Relates to extending the exemption from filing requirements only with respect to rates and policy forms to businesses underwritten and transacted from an office outside this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.479 |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |