NY S03562 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3562A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3562A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to primary elections and amends certain deadlines to facilitate the timely transmission of ballots to military voters stationed overseas; relates to filling vacancies in elective offices; relates to the date of primary elections.
Title
Relates to primary elections and amends certain deadlines to facilitate the timely transmission of ballots to military voters stationed overseas; relates to filling vacancies in elective offices; relates to the date of primary elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3562A |
2018-03-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A03052 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - enacting clause stricken
A09925 (Same As) 2018-05-03 - advanced to third reading cal.847
A09925 (Same As) 2018-05-03 - advanced to third reading cal.847