NY S03559 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties for the failure to provide appropriate shelter to a dog left outdoors.
Title
Relates to penalties for the failure to provide appropriate shelter to a dog left outdoors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.187 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.892 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A01901 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture