NY S03533 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class E felony of vehicular assault in the third degree; redefines the requirements for a violation of vehicular assault in the second degree; expands the offenses of vehicular assault and vehicular manslaughter; and establishes the class D felony of vehicular manslaughter in the third degree.
Title
Establishes the class E felony of vehicular assault in the third degree; redefines the requirements for a violation of vehicular assault in the second degree; expands the offenses of vehicular assault and vehicular manslaughter; and establishes the class D felony of vehicular manslaughter in the third degree.
Sponsors
Sen. John Flanagan [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1277 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.168 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |