NY S03526 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Bethlehem to establish community preservation funds; authorizes the town of Bethlehem to impose a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Bethlehem to establish community preservation funds; authorizes the town of Bethlehem to impose a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.677
2018-02-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 3526B
2018-02-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.330
2017-02-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 3526A
2017-02-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-01-24SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A03028 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - amended on third reading 3028b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback