NY S03514 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from charging for the process of a FOIL request made by state and local agencies or the state legislature.
Title
Prohibits agencies from charging for the process of a FOIL request made by state and local agencies or the state legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00640 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations