NY S03504 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Oneida county sheriff and correctional facility to hold detained persons between arrest and arraignment.
Title
Permits the Oneida county sheriff and correctional facility to hold detained persons between arrest and arraignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.234 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.136 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a3824 |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03824 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - substituted by s3504